MA S1387 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2443

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the contraction of MRSA by public safety personnel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the contraction of MRSA by public safety personnel.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-27SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2443
2011-06-16JointHearing scheduled for 06/28/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2011-01-24HouseHouse concurred.
2011-01-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Service.
2011-01-18SenateBill Filed.

Same As/Similar To

S2443 (Replaced by) 2012-10-01 - Discharged to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback