MA S1359 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure compliance with the anti-shackling law for pregnant incarcerated women. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To ensure compliance with the anti-shackling law for pregnant incarcerated women
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/03/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1023 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
S1278 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H805 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H307 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3509 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3498 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4357
H1211 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1278 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H805 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H307 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3509 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3498 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4357
H1211 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1359 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1359.pdf |