MA S1353 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2480
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2480
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2480
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enable pharmacists to prescribe, dispense and administer PrEP. Public Health.
Title
Enabling pharmacists to prescribe, dispense and administer PrEP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-26 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2480 |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Read second |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, October 26, 2023 |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2480 |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Accompanied by H2225 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S714 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
H2225 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Accompanied S1353
S2480 (Replaced by) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2225 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Accompanied S1353
S2480 (Replaced by) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1353 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1353.pdf |