MA S1347 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to anesthesiologist assistants. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to anesthesiologist assistants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-15SenateSenate concurred
2024-07-08HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-05-30SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-18HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-21SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2024-03-21SenateAccompanied by H2229
2023-09-18JointHearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2229 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied S1327
H4136 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4625 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4709 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback