MA S1341 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to elevator certificates. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to elevator certificates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S793 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1195 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied H1163
S1347 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1757 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3229 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H585 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S1195 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied H1163
S1347 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1757 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3229 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H585 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1341 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1341.pdf |