MA S133 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2357
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to weights and measures. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to weights and measures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2357 |
2015-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2357 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S104 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2257
S202 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied H3806
S155 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S990 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3277 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1916 (Similar To) 2016-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2236
S104 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2257
S202 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied H3806
S155 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S990 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3277 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1916 (Similar To) 2016-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2236
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S133 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S133.pdf |