MA S1325 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2292

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to repeal the ban on modern sporting rifles. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the ban on modern sporting rifles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2292
2017-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1323 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H1239 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1287 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2292 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback