MA S1325 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on November 21 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-21 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 21 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-21 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the residency requirements of assistant treasurers and collectors. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the residency requirements of assistant treasurers and collectors.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Rep. John Fernandes [D] | Rep. Steven Levy [R] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-11-21 | House | Enacted |
2011-11-21 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-17 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-09-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-09-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-09-19 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-07-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2011-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 01:10 PM-04:40 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1325 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10371&generalCourtId=1 |