MA S1324 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2292

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to change of address for firearm licensing. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to change of address for firearm licensing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2292
2017-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S593 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
S1166 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Senate concurred
S1928 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2457
S1319 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S135 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2191 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1045 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1053 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H140 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H503 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H1265 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H477 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Hearing scheduled for 01/09/18 from 10:30AM-1:00PM in A-2
S2292 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback