MA S1284 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require the disclosure of lead in water pipes to prospective purchasers of premises. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require the disclosure of lead in water pipes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2020-02-10HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-06SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S955 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S500 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2503
H1872 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback