MA S1276 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an advisory committee on the accessibility of fresh food retail in communities throughout the Commonwealth. Public Health.
Title
Resolve establishing an advisory committee on the accessibility of fresh food retail in communities throughout the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. James Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-25 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2017-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S614 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S635 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S1901 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H195 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1796 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2673 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2188 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S635 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S1901 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H195 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1796 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2673 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2188 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1276 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1276.pdf |