MA S127 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2283
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to register professional employer organizations operating in Massachusetts. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the recognition and registration of professional employer organizations operating in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2283 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 17, 2012 |
2012-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2012-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 3, 2012 |
2011-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2283 (Replaced by) 2012-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S127 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10816&generalCourtId=1 |