MA S127 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4733
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the practice of cosmetology
Title
Relative to the practice of cosmetology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4733 | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Thursday, April 30, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4733 (Replaced by) 2010-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S127 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=2015&generalCourtId=2 |