MA S1267 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to grant equal access to original birth certificates to all persons born in Massachusetts. Public Health.
Title
Granting equal access to original birth certificates to all persons born in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1892 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2870 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1906 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3933
S609 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H432 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2870 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1906 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3933
S609 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H432 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1267 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1267.pdf |