MA S1266 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2447
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate central service technicians. Public Health.
Title
Regulating central service technicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-30 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2447 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1503 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2292 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1378 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S112 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1342 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H4001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4528
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2447 (Replaced by) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2292 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1378 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S112 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1342 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H4001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4528
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2447 (Replaced by) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1266 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1266.pdf |