MA S126 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further define gas fitting under the regulation of plumbing. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Further defining gas fitting under the regulation of plumbing
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S881 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S964 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1263 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H181 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H150 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S964 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1263 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H181 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H150 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S126 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S126.pdf |