MA S123 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-25 - Accompanying a new draft, see S1975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-25 - Accompanying a new draft, see S1975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate business practices between motor vehicle dealers, manufacturers and distributors. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Further regulating business practices between motor vehicle dealers, manufacturers, and distributors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-25 | Senate | Accompanying a new draft, see S1975 |
2011-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S123 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11638&generalCourtId=1 |