MA S1218 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2439
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote safety in the transportation of students
Title
Promote safety in the transportation of students.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Kathi-Anne Reinstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2439 |
2011-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2011 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2439 (Replaced by) 2012-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1218 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10479&generalCourtId=1 |