MA S1217 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2093
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify dual service. Public Service.
Title
Clarifying dual service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2093 |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2093 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1217 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1217.pdf |