MA S1217 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to rock wall climbing safeguards
Title
Relative to rock wall climbing safeguards.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Rep. Steven Walsh [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Robert Fennell [D] |
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-04-24 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Read second (amended), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-06-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2011-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1217 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10485&generalCourtId=1 |