MA S1197 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to uniform disciplinary procedures for correctional officers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to uniform disciplinary procedures for correctional officers
Sponsors
Sen. James Timilty [D] | Rep. Christopher Fallon [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Michael Finn [D] |
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Sen. Richard Moore [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1197 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1197.pdf |