MA S1183 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the unemployment insurance law for workers with fluctuating work schedules. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Amending the unemployment insurance law for workers with fluctuating work schedules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Accompanied by H1883 |
2023-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1883 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Accompanied S1183
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1183 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1183.pdf |