MA S1167 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2550
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to regional navigators for substance abuse treatment. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to regional navigators for substance abuse treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2550 |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1753 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S2550 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2550 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1167 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1167.pdf |