MA S1158 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H2367
Note: Legislation replaced by S2377

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a board of registration in naturopathy. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a board of registration in naturopathy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-26SenateNew draft substituted, see S2377
2012-07-26SenateRead second
2012-07-25SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 26, 2012
2012-07-25SenateReferred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
2012-07-25SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2377
2012-05-14SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2012-05-09SenateRecommitted to the committee on Health Care Financing
2012-05-09SenateRules suspended
2012-05-09SenateOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
2011-07-20SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare Financing
2011-07-18SenateAccompanied by H2367
2011-04-05JointHearing scheduled for 04/12/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2011-01-24HouseHouse concurred
2011-01-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2367 (Replaces) 2011-07-20 - Accompanying S1158
S2377 (Replaced by) 2013-01-11 - Pocket vetoed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback