MA S1146 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2253
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-08 - New draft substituted, see S2253
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-08 - New draft substituted, see S2253
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to rock wall climbing safeguards. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to rock wall climbing safeguards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2253 |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2253 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2253 (Replaced by) 2014-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 305 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1146 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1146.pdf |