MA S1144 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to technical changes pertaining to the Board of Registration in Medicine. Public Health.
Title
Relative to technical changes pertaining to the Board of Registration in Medicine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Senate | Accompanying a new draft, see S2243 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1144 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14038&generalCourtId=1 |