MA S1135 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restore community trust in Massachusetts law enforcement. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To restore community trust in Massachusetts law enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1135 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1135.pdf |