MA S1104 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2548

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to a prevailing wage for trash and recycling collectors, moving contractors, and motor bus pupil transporters. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a prevailing wage for trash and recycling collectors, moving contractors, and motor bus pupil transporters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2548
2019-06-11JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H1695 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1059 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S2162 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H1633 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1599 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1618 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
H1671 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1073 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S2548 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback