MA S1104 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2385
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to local licenses and permits. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to local licenses and permits
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Spilka [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2385 |
2015-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2385 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S926 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H4401 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Ordered to a third reading
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S1671 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1211 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S926 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H4401 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Ordered to a third reading
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S1671 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1211 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1104 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1104.pdf |