MA S110 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2414
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the granting of temporary licenses for the sale of wine, beer, and malt liquor at auctions for nonprofit charitable corporations. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Regulating the granting of temporary licenses for the sale of wine, beer, and malt liquor at auctions for nonprofit charitable corporations
Sponsors
Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] |
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2414 |
2017-09-08 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-08-29 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 428 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1029 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
S1709 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S375 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3592 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3143 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1279 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2414 (Replaced by) 2018-04-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4768 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2018
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1029 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
S1709 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S375 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3592 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3143 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1279 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2414 (Replaced by) 2018-04-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4768 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2018
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S110 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S110.pdf |