MA S1091 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to eliminate racial and ethnic health disparities in the Commonwealth
Title
To eliminate racial and ethnic health disparities in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-07-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare Financing |
2011-07-18 | Joint | Accompanied by H1517 |
2011-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1517 (Replaces) 2011-07-20 - Accompanied S1091
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1091 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13420&generalCourtId=1 |