MA S109 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-22 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-22 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Milton to grant a license for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises of a certain restaurant. [Local approval received.] Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Authorizing the town of Milton to grant a license for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises of a certain restaurant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-22 | Senate | Accompanying a new draft, see S2019 |
2011-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurs |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S109 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11236&generalCourtId=1 |