MA S1062 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2488
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to chapter 351 of the acts of 2016. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Relative to chapter 351 of the acts of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2488 |
2018-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1060 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1523 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4210
S360 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H2381 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H2388 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H362 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1775 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3174 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
S2488 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1523 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4210
S360 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H2381 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H2388 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H362 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1775 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3174 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
S2488 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1062 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1062.pdf |