MA S1060 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2775
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2775
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2775
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to unemployment insurance benefits for replacement workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to unemployment insurance benefits for replacement workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2775 |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 6, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-03-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1627 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1061 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1075 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1093 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1643 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2775 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1061 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1075 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1093 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1643 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2775 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1060 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1060.pdf |