MA S1046 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4272
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to services for individuals with autism spectrum disorder. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
To ensure full and equal access to services from the Department of Mental Health for individuals with autism spectrum disorders and related conditions who otherwise meet the eligibility criteria for DMH services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4272 |
2015-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4272 (Replaced by) 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S313 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2343
S1180 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
S611 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1826 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2178
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1006 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H77 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H1061 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H3022 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H3003 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
S313 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2343
S1180 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
S611 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1826 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2178
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1006 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H77 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H1061 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H3022 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H3003 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1046 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1046.pdf |