MA S1038 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the city of Brockton's calculation of its local contribution to net school spending
Title
Relative to the City of Brockton's calculations of its local contribution to net school spending
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2437 |
2011-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2011 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2437 (Replaced by) 2012-10-15 - Reportd (in part) by S2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1038 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13026&generalCourtId=1 |