MA S103 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the resale of tickets. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the resale of tickets.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | House | House concurred |
2012-07-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 17, 2012 |
2012-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2012-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 3, 2012 |
2011-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S103 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12326&generalCourtId=1 |