MA S1002 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4605
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance employment opportunities. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To enhance employment opportunities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4605 |
2015-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4605 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1687 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S107 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1329 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S85 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S979 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1468 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4231
S1456 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S959 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S853 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H1762 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1687 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S107 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1329 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S85 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S979 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1468 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4231
S1456 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S959 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S853 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H1762 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1002 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1002.pdf |