MA S100 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H239
Note: Legislation replaced by S2415
Note: Legislation replaced by S2415
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - New draft substituted, see S2415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - New draft substituted, see S2415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to maintain public water systems. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To maintain public water systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2415 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Read second |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2415 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Accompanied by H239 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 03, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H239 (Replaces) 2014-06-05 - Accompanied S100
S2415 (Replaced by) 2014-12-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2415 (Replaced by) 2014-12-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S100 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S100.pdf |