MA S1 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-03 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the general concerns of the Commonwealth

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Message from His Excellency the Governor relative to the general concerns of the Commonwealth

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-03SenatePlaced on file

Same As/Similar To

H84 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S1915 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1866 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1844 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2762 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
H4019 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2019
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4021 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2019
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
H4252 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - See H4246

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback