MA H996 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 282 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 282 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to making technical corrections in the law relative to discharge of certain mortgages
Title
Making technical corrections in the law relative to discharge of certain mortgages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 282 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-31 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-31 | Enacted | |
2010-07-31 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-31 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-31 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-07-15 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-07-13 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-03-31 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-29 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-03-03 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 9/30 at 1:00 PM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00996.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00996.htm |