MA H99 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4387

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the membership of the Massachusetts Food Policy Council. Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Massachusetts Food Policy Council

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-12HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4387
2023-04-27JointHearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H4136 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4387 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4456 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4761
H4625 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4658 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4709 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback