MA H989 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow retail stores to open during holidays. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Allowing retail stores and shops to open on Thanksgiving day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4539 |
2011-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2011 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H4539 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H989 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12675&generalCourtId=1 |