MA H987 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4957
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4957
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4957
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home service contracts
Title
Relative to home service contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-31 | New draft substituted, see H4957 | |
2010-07-31 | Read second | |
2010-07-31 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-31 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending | |
2010-07-30 | Referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | |
2010-07-30 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a bill with the same title, see H4957 | |
2009-06-01 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4957 (Replaced by) 2010-07-31 - Ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H987 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=5279&generalCourtId=2 |