MA H985 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide adult transitional support services for persons with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To support the transition to adult services for persons with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-02-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-10-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Bristol Community College |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H985 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10902&generalCourtId=1 |