MA H982 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to job opportunities for people with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To increase the Commonwealth's compliance with federal law meeting requirements of the Americans with Disabilities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-02-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H982 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13171&generalCourtId=1 |