MA H97 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to education or training activities for purposes of meeting the Department of Transitional Assistance work requirement for applicants seeking certain master’s degrees. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to education or training activities for purposes of meeting the Department of Transitional Assistance work requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/24/2017 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S36 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H94 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H84 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1961 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H96 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2553 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H94 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H84 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1961 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H96 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2553 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H97 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H97.pdf |