MA H955 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3541
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating insurance for portable electronic devices. Financial Services.
Title
Regulating portable electronics insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3541 |
2013-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2013 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3541 (Replaced by) 2014-01-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H955 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H955.pdf |