MA H950 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electronic notices of the cancellation, renewal or nonrenewal of insurance policies. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to notices by insurance companies
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1100 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1031 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S598 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S621 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H3558 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1100 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1031 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S598 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S621 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H3558 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H950 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H950.pdf |