MA H948 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4455

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the transmitting of indecent visual depictions by persons younger than eighteen years of age. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transmitting indecent visual depictions by teens

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4455
2018-04-19SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-21HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 21, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-11-16JointHearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4455 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback